House | 03/31/2021 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Government Modernization and Efficiency Committee | ||
House | 03/22/2021 | Second Reading referred to Government Modernization and Efficiency | ||
Senate | 03/15/2021 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/15/2021 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/11/2021 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/11/2021 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 32 Nays: 12 | ||
Senate | 03/11/2021 | Title restored | ||
Senate | 03/11/2021 | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute | ||
Senate | 03/01/2021 | Title stricken | ||
Senate | 03/01/2021 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/19/2021 | Referred to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 02/19/2021 | Reported Do Pass as amended Public Safety committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/10/2021 | Coauthored by Representative Frix (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/02/2021 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee | ||
Senate | 02/01/2021 | Authored by Senator Allen |