Senate | 05/11/2022 | Approved by Governor 05/11/2022 | ||
Senate | 05/10/2022 | Sent to Governor | ||
Senate | 05/10/2022 | Enrolled, to House | ||
House | 05/10/2022 | Signed, returned to Senate | ||
Senate | 05/09/2022 | Referred for enrollment | ||
Senate | 05/09/2022 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 5 | ||
Senate | 05/09/2022 | HAs adopted | ||
Senate | 05/02/2022 | HAs read | ||
House | 05/02/2022 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
House | 04/28/2022 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 73 Nays: 4 | ||
House | 04/28/2022 | Amended | ||
House | 04/28/2022 | House Rule suspended | ||
House | 04/28/2022 | General Order | ||
House | 04/28/2022 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 04/12/2022 | CR; Do Pass Common Education Committee | ||
House | 03/31/2022 | Second Reading referred to Common Education | ||
Senate | 03/10/2022 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/10/2022 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/09/2022 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 7 | ||
Senate | 03/09/2022 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 03/01/2022 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Education committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/02/2021 | Second Reading referred to Education | ||
Senate | 02/01/2021 | Coauthored by Representative Randleman (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/01/2021 | Authored by Senator Bullard |