House
|
04/08/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) McDugle, Lepak
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2021
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2021
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2021
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2021
|
Emergency passed: Ayes: 32 Nays: 14
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2021
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 25 Nays: 21
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2021
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Bullard
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2021
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Bergstrom
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative ODonnell (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2021
|
Remove as coauthor Senator Boren
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2021
|
Referred to Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2021
|
Withdrawn from Education committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Boren
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Senator Daniels
|
|
|