Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB634 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 21, 2021

Engrossed

Bill March 8, 2021

Amended

Bill April 9, 2021
Bill February 24, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 9, 2021
Bill February 23, 2021