Senate
|
05/28/2021
|
Approved by Governor 05/28/2021
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2021
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2021
|
Signed, returned to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2021
|
Enrolled, to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2021
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2021
|
To Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2021
|
Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 1
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator(s) Jech
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2021
|
CCR adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2021
|
CCR submitted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2021
|
Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 47 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2021
|
Emergency removed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2021
|
CCR read
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2021
|
Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Higher Education and Career Tech
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2021
|
SCs named Pugh, Pemberton, Kidd, Taylor, Dossett (J.J.), Dossett (J.A.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2021
|
HAs rejected, conference requested
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2021
|
Coauthored by Dollens
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2021
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2021
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2021
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 98 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2021
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2021
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2021
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Higher Education and Career Tech Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Higher Education and Career Tech
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2021
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2021
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 9
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2021
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2021
|
General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Bergstrom
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Bullard
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative Baker (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2021
|
Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Stephens
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2021
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2021
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2021
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Education committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Senator Pugh
|
|
|