Senate
|
05/26/2021
|
CCR read
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2021
|
SCs named Paxton, Weaver, Jech, Coleman, Brooks, Matthews
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2021
|
Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on County and Municipal Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2021
|
HAs rejected, conference requested
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Stephens
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2021
|
Remove as author Senator Stephens; authored by Senator Paxton
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2021
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2021
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 83 Nays: 11
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2021
|
Amended by floor substitute
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Gann, Smith
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2021
|
Considered
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2021
|
House Rule suspended
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2021
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2021
|
Laid over
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2021
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2021
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2021
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute County and Municipal Government Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2021
|
Second Reading referred to County and Municipal Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2021
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Jett
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2021
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 8
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2021
|
General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2021
|
Coauthored by McDugle
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative Roberts (Sean) (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2021
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Bergstrom
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Bullard
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Hamilton
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Public Safety
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Senator Stephens
|
|
|