Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB644 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 21, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 21, 2021
Bill March 10, 2021

Amended

Bill March 29, 2021
Bill February 22, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 26, 2021
Bill March 29, 2021
Bill February 19, 2021