Senate
|
05/07/2021
|
Approved by Governor 05/07/2021
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2021
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2021
|
Signed, returned to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2021
|
Enrolled, to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2021
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2021
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2021
|
HAs adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2021
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2021
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2021
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 97 Nays: 2
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2021
|
Emergency added
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2021
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2021
|
House Rule suspended
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) McBride
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2021
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2021
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2021
|
Remove Representative McBride as principal House author and substitute with Representative Lepak
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2021
|
CR; Do Pass Banking, Financial Services and Pensions Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Banking, Financial Services and Pensions
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2021
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2021
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2021
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative McBride (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Senator Kidd
|
|
|