Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB683 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 21, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 19, 2021
Bill March 15, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 3, 2021

Amended

Bill March 29, 2021
Bill February 23, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill February 22, 2021