House | 03/31/2021 | CR; Do Pass Public Health Committee | ||
House | 03/22/2021 | Second Reading referred to Public Health | ||
Senate | 03/11/2021 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/11/2021 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/10/2021 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/10/2021 | Measure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 0 | ||
Senate | 03/10/2021 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 03/08/2021 | Coauthored by Representative Hasenbeck (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/22/2021 | Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/02/2021 | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services | ||
Senate | 02/01/2021 | Authored by Senator Pugh |