Senate | 04/26/2021 | HAs read | ||
House | 04/26/2021 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
House | 04/22/2021 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 84 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 04/22/2021 | General Order | ||
House | 04/22/2021 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 04/08/2021 | Title restored | ||
House | 04/08/2021 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee | ||
House | 03/29/2021 | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/22/2021 | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/22/2021 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | ||
Senate | 03/10/2021 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/10/2021 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/09/2021 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 | ||
Senate | 03/09/2021 | Title stricken | ||
Senate | 03/09/2021 | General Order, Amended | ||
Senate | 02/18/2021 | Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/10/2021 | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appr/Sub-Education sub-committee | ||
Senate | 02/08/2021 | Coauthored by Representative Hardin (Tommy) (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/02/2021 | Referred to Appr/Sub-Education | ||
Senate | 02/02/2021 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 02/01/2021 | Authored by Senator Simpson |