Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB70 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 1, 2020

Engrossed

Bill April 26, 2021
Bill March 10, 2021

Amended

Bill April 9, 2021
Bill February 21, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 9, 2021