Senate
|
04/26/2022
|
Approved by Governor 04/26/2022
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2022
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2022
|
Signed, returned to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2022
|
Enrolled, to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2022
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2022
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 3
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2022
|
HAs adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2022
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2022
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2022
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 68 Nays: 20
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2022
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2022
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2022
|
Emergency added
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2022
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Health Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Public Health
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2022
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2022
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2022
|
Emergency failed: Ayes: 31 Nays: 15
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2022
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 31 Nays: 15
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2022
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative Roe (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2022
|
Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
Remove as author Senator McCortney; authored by Senator Rosino
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Senator McCortney
|
|
|