Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB709 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 21, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 21, 2022
Bill March 15, 2022

Enrolled

Bill April 25, 2022

Amended

Bill April 13, 2022
Bill February 15, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill April 13, 2022