Senate
|
05/20/2022
|
Enacting clause restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2022
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2022
|
CCR read
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2022
|
Conference granted, naming GCCA
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2022
|
SCs named GCCA
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2022
|
HAs rejected, conference requested
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2022
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2022
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2022
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 63 Nays: 12
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2022
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2022
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2022
|
Enacting clause stricken
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2022
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Hilbert
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2022
|
CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2021
|
Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Transportation Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2021
|
Referred to Appropriations and Budget Transportation Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2021
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2021
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 31 Nays: 11
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2021
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2021
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Garvin
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2021
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2021
|
Reported Do Pass Finance committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative Moore (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Senator Howard
|
|
|