Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB735 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 21, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 21, 2022
Bill March 10, 2021

Amended

Bill April 14, 2022
Bill March 4, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill March 3, 2021