Senate
|
05/20/2022
|
Approved by Governor 05/20/2022
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2022
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2022
|
Signed, returned to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2022
|
Enrolled, to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2022
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2022
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2022
|
HAs adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2022
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2022
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2022
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 73 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2022
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2022
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Banking, Financial Services and Pensions Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2021
|
Referred to Actuary pursuant to the Oklahoma Pension Legislation Actuarial Analysis Act
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Banking, Financial Services and Pensions
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2021
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2021
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2021
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative Moore (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2021
|
Reported Do Pass Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Senator Weaver
|
|
|