Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB743 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 21, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 21, 2022
Bill March 10, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 17, 2022

Amended

Bill March 2, 2022
Bill February 21, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill March 1, 2022