Senate | 04/26/2021 | Approved by Governor 04/26/2021 | ||
Senate | 04/21/2021 | Sent to Governor | ||
Senate | 04/21/2021 | Enrolled, to House | ||
House | 04/21/2021 | Signed, returned to Senate | ||
Senate | 04/20/2021 | Referred for enrollment | ||
House | 04/20/2021 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 6 | ||
House | 04/20/2021 | General Order | ||
House | 04/06/2021 | CR; Do Pass Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/24/2021 | Second Reading referred to Rules | ||
Senate | 02/11/2021 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 02/11/2021 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 02/10/2021 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 02/10/2021 | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 4 | ||
Senate | 02/10/2021 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 02/04/2021 | Coauthored by Representative Martinez (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/04/2021 | Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/02/2021 | Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism | ||
Senate | 02/01/2021 | Authored by Senator Jech |