Senate
|
03/09/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Quinn
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Leewright
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Standridge
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Burns
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Pemberton
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Pederson
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative Conley
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Dahm
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Newhouse
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Murdock
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative Gann
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative Olsen
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative Stearman
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Merrick
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Stephens
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2022
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative West (Kevin) (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Bergstrom
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Rogers
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Jett
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Senator Bullard
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|