Senate
|
05/28/2021
|
Approved by Governor 05/28/2021
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2021
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2021
|
Signed, returned to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2021
|
Enrolled, to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2021
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2021
|
To Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2021
|
Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 79 Nays: 16
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Patzkowsky, Roberts (Sean)
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2021
|
CCR adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2021
|
CCR submitted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2021
|
Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 37 Nays: 9
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2021
|
Enacting clause restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2021
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2021
|
CCR read
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2021
|
Conference granted, naming GCCA
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2021
|
SCs named Daniels, McCortney, Rosino, Simpson, Dossett (J.A.), Hicks
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2021
|
HAs rejected, conference requested
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2021
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2021
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2021
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 76 Nays: 19
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2021
|
Enacting clause stricken
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2021
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2021
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2021
|
Amended by floor substitute
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2021
|
House Rule suspended
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator(s) Bergstrom
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Dills, Gann, Smith
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2021
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2021
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator(s) Jett
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2021
|
CR; Do Pass Public Health Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Public Health
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2021
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Taylor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2021
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 9
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2021
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator David
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2021
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative Lepak (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Stephens
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2021
|
Remove as coauthor Senator Boren
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Bullard
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2021
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2021
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Boren
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Senator Daniels
|
|
|