Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB779 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 21, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 22, 2021
Bill March 11, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 25, 2021

Amended

Bill April 7, 2021
Bill March 4, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 14, 2021
Bill March 3, 2021