Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB782 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 21, 2021

Engrossed

Bill March 11, 2021

Enrolled

Bill April 22, 2021

Amended

Bill April 7, 2021
Bill February 23, 2021