Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB794 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 21, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 19, 2021
Bill March 10, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 3, 2021

Amended

Bill March 31, 2021
Bill February 12, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill March 31, 2021