Senate | 03/03/2021 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/22/2021 | Coauthored by Representative Marti (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/19/2021 | Referred to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 02/19/2021 | Title stricken | ||
Senate | 02/19/2021 | Reported Do Pass as amended Public Safety committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/02/2021 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee | ||
Senate | 02/01/2021 | Authored by Senator Bullard | ||
Senate | 02/01/2021 | First Reading |