Senate | 04/26/2021 | Approved by Governor 04/26/2021 | ||
Senate | 04/21/2021 | Sent to Governor | ||
Senate | 04/21/2021 | Enrolled, to House | ||
House | 04/21/2021 | Signed, returned to Senate | ||
Senate | 04/20/2021 | Referred for enrollment | ||
House | 04/20/2021 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 75 Nays: 16 | ||
House | 04/20/2021 | General Order | ||
House | 04/06/2021 | CR; Do Pass Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/22/2021 | Second Reading referred to Rules | ||
Senate | 03/09/2021 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/09/2021 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/08/2021 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/08/2021 | Measure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 6 | ||
Senate | 03/08/2021 | Title restored | ||
Senate | 03/08/2021 | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute | ||
Senate | 02/18/2021 | Coauthored by Representative West (Kevin) (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/11/2021 | Title stricken | ||
Senate | 02/11/2021 | Reported Do Pass as amended General Government committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/02/2021 | Second Reading referred to General Government | ||
Senate | 02/01/2021 | Authored by Senator Standridge |