Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB825 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 21, 2021

Engrossed

Bill March 9, 2021

Enrolled

Bill April 21, 2021

Amended

Bill April 6, 2021
Bill February 12, 2021