House | 03/29/2021 | Coauthored by Senator(s) Jett, Dugger | ||
House | 03/29/2021 | CR; Do Pass County and Municipal Government Committee | ||
House | 03/22/2021 | Second Reading referred to County and Municipal Government | ||
Senate | 02/11/2021 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 02/11/2021 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 02/10/2021 | Coauthored by Senator Bullard | ||
Senate | 02/10/2021 | Coauthored by Senator Bergstrom | ||
Senate | 02/10/2021 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 02/10/2021 | Measure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 6 | ||
Senate | 02/10/2021 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 02/08/2021 | Coauthored by Representative Ford (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/04/2021 | Coauthored by Senator Stephens | ||
Senate | 02/04/2021 | Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/02/2021 | Second Reading referred to General Government | ||
Senate | 02/01/2021 | Authored by Senator Weaver |