Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Murdock
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
Referred to Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
Withdrawn from General Government committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative Wallace
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Standridge
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative Moore
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative Rosecrants
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative Stinson
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Burns
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative McDugle
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Merrick
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Weaver
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Pemberton
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative Humphrey
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Bergstrom
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative Bashore
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Boren
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative Hardin (David)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Newhouse
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative West (Josh) (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Jett
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Hamilton
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to General Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Senator Stephens
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|