House | 04/07/2021 | Enacting clause stricken | ||
House | 04/07/2021 | Coauthored by Senator(s) Bergstrom | ||
House | 04/07/2021 | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Public Health Committee | ||
House | 03/22/2021 | Second Reading referred to Public Health | ||
Senate | 03/08/2021 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/08/2021 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/04/2021 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/04/2021 | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 1 | ||
Senate | 03/04/2021 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 03/02/2021 | Coauthored by Senator Hamilton | ||
Senate | 02/18/2021 | Coauthored by Representative CrosswhiteHader (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/08/2021 | Title stricken | ||
Senate | 02/08/2021 | Reported Do Pass as amended Agriculture and Wildlife committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/02/2021 | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Wildlife | ||
Senate | 02/01/2021 | Authored by Senator Dahm |