Senate | 04/21/2021 | Approved by Governor 04/21/2021 | ||
Senate | 04/15/2021 | Sent to Governor | ||
Senate | 04/15/2021 | Enrolled, to House | ||
House | 04/15/2021 | Signed, returned to Senate | ||
Senate | 04/14/2021 | Referred for enrollment | ||
House | 04/14/2021 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 04/14/2021 | General Order | ||
House | 03/30/2021 | CR; Do Pass Veterans and Military Affairs Committee | ||
House | 03/22/2021 | Second Reading referred to Veterans and Military Affairs | ||
Senate | 03/10/2021 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/10/2021 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/09/2021 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/09/2021 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 | ||
Senate | 03/09/2021 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 03/02/2021 | Coauthored by Representative Miller (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/04/2021 | Emergency added | ||
Senate | 02/04/2021 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Veterans and Military Affairs committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/01/2021 | Authored by Senator Simpson |