Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB86 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 4, 2020

Engrossed

Bill March 10, 2021

Enrolled

Bill April 15, 2021

Amended

Bill March 31, 2021
Bill February 8, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill February 4, 2021