Oklahoma 2022 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB86 Amended / Bill

Filed 02/08/2021

                     
 
SENATE FLOOR VERSION - SB86 SFLR 	Page 1 
(Bold face denotes Committee Amendments)  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
SENATE FLOOR VERSION 
February 4, 2021 
 
 
COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE 
FOR 
SENATE BILL NO. 86 	By: Simpson 
 
 
 
 
 
An Act relating to veterans; amending 72 O.S. 2011, 
Section 63.2, as last amended by Section 2, Chapter 
262, O.S.L. 2014 (72 O.S. Supp. 2 020, Section 63.2), 
which relates to the Oklahoma Veterans Commission; 
modifying membership crite ria of Commission; 
providing an effective date; and declaring an 
emergency. 
 
 
 
 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA: 
SECTION 1.     AMENDATORY     72 O.S. 2011, Section 63.2, as 
last amended by Section 2, Chapter 262, O.S.L. 2014 (72 O.S. Supp. 
2020, Section 63.2), is amended to read as follow s: 
Section 63.2. The Oklahoma Veterans Commission shall consist of 
nine (9) members.  At least eight (8) members all of whom shall be 
honorably discharged veterans ; provided, three one of the members 
shall be veterans a veteran of the Vietnam Conflict and one two 
shall be a veteran veterans of the Persian Gulf Wars. The members 
shall be selected in the following manner:  The state executive 
board or committees of the veterans ’ organizations named in this 
section shall each sub mit to the Governor of Oklahoma a list of five   
 
SENATE FLOOR VERSION - SB86 SFLR 	Page 2 
(Bold face denotes Committee Amendments)  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
(5) persons qualified to serve as members of the Oklahoma Veterans 
Commission.  All appointments shall be broadly representative of the 
veterans of this state in term s of age, gender, and race or 
ethnicity. The list shall be submitted to the Governor not later 
than three (3) months prior to the expirat ion of the terms of office 
of the members of the Oklahoma Veterans Commission.  The Governor 
shall name one member from each of the following Veterans’ groups:  
the American Legion; the Veterans of Foreign wars Wars; the Disabled 
American Veterans; the Par alyzed Veterans of America; the Military 
Order of the Purple Heart; and th e National Guard Association of 
Oklahoma.  The members representing the American Legion and the 
Paralyzed Veterans of America shall take offic e no later than July 
1, 2015.  The members representing the Veterans of Foreign Wars and 
the Military Order of the Purple Heart shall take office no later 
than July 1, 2016.  The members representing the Disabled Ame rican 
Veterans and the Oklahoma National Guard Association of Oklahoma 
shall take office no later than July 1, 2017.  The Governor shall 
also appoint three members at large, one of whom may be a nonvetera n 
and shall have a family member residing in a state veteran center, 
one to be appointed 201 5, one to be appointed in 2016, and one to be 
appointed in 2017. 
The executive officer of each veterans’ organization operating 
within the State of Oklahoma this state shall, on or before January 
1 of the year in whi ch the organization’s appointee’s term expires,   
 
SENATE FLOOR VERSION - SB86 SFLR 	Page 3 
(Bold face denotes Committee Amendments)  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
submit to the Secretary of State , the Governor, the President Pro 
Tempore of the Senate, and the Speaker o f the House of 
Representatives a copy of the perfo rmance audit and the financial 
audit of the organiza tion for the immediately preceding fisca l year 
of the organization.  Such audits shall be conducted in accordance 
with auditing standards generally accept ed in the United States and 
shall clearly show the total paid membership of the organization and 
shall be certified to by a certified public a ccountant.  Failure to 
comply with this section shall render the organization ineligible to 
submit a nominee to th e Governor.  The members of the Commission 
shall be appointed by the Governor with advice and consent of the 
Senate, and shall serve at the pl easure of the Governor.  When a 
vacancy on the Oklahoma Veterans Commission occurs, the organization 
which is represented by the vacant position shall submit a list of 
five (5) names to the Governor.  The Governor sh all choose a 
replacement from that list.  No person shall be appointed by the 
Governor who is related by affinity or consanguinity within the 
third degree to any perso n employed by the Oklahoma Department of 
Veterans Affairs. 
Before any member appointed as provided herein shall enter upon 
his or her duties as a member of the Commission, h e or she shall 
take and subscribe to the oath of office as required by the 
Constitution of this state.   
 
SENATE FLOOR VERSION - SB86 SFLR 	Page 4 
(Bold face denotes Committee Amendments)  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
Present members of the Commissio n shall continue in office until 
the expiration of their terms and until their s uccessors are 
appointed and enter upon th e duties of their offices.  Appointments 
shall be made for a three-year period.  Any vacancy on the 
Commission resulting from any cause shall be filled by appointment 
by the Governor for the remainder of the term as provided in this 
section. 
No member of the Oklahoma Veterans Commission shall be employed 
by the Oklahoma Department of Ve terans Affairs during the time of 
his or her service on the Oklahoma Veterans Commission nor shall any 
person who served as a member of the Oklahoma Veterans Commission be 
employed by the Oklahoma Department of Veterans Affairs subsequent 
to his or her service on the Commission for a period of two (2) 
years. 
SECTION 2.  This act shall become effective July 1, 2021. 
SECTION 3.  It being immediately necessary for the preservation 
of the public peace, health or safety, an emergency is hereby 
declared to exist, by reason whereof this act shall take effect and 
be in full force from and after its passage and approval. 
COMMITTEE REPORT BY: COMMITTEE ON VETERANS AND MIL ITARY AFFAIRS 
February 4, 2021 - DO PASS AS AMENDED