Oklahoma 2022 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB86 Amended / Bill

Filed 03/31/2021

                     
 
SB86 HFLR 	Page 1 
BOLD FACE denotes Committee Amendments.  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES - FLOOR VERSION 
 
STATE OF OKLAHOMA 
 
1st Session of the 58th Legislature (2021) 
 
ENGROSSED SENATE 
BILL NO. 86 	By: Simpson of the Senate 
 
  and 
 
  Miller of the House 
 
 
 
 
An Act relating to veterans; amending 72 O.S. 2011, 
Section 63.2, as last amended by Section 2, Chapter 
262, O.S.L. 2014 (72 O.S. Supp. 2020, Section 63.2), 
which relates to the Oklahoma Veterans Commission; 
modifying membership criteria of Commission; 
providing an effective date ; and declaring an 
emergency. 
 
 
 
 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA: 
SECTION 1.     AMENDATORY     72 O.S. 2011, Section 63.2, as 
last amended by Section 2, Chapter 262, O.S.L. 2014 (72 O.S. Supp. 
2020, Section 63.2), is amended to read as follows: 
Section 63.2.  The Oklahoma Veterans Commission shall consist of 
nine (9) members.  At least eight (8) members all of whom shall be 
honorably discharged veterans; provided, three one of the members 
shall be veterans a veteran of the Vietnam Conflict and one two 
shall be a veteran veterans of the Persian Gulf Wars.  The members 
shall be selected in the following manner:  The state executive   
 
SB86 HFLR 	Page 2 
BOLD FACE denotes Committee Amendments.  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
board or committees of the veterans ’ organizations named in this 
section shall each submit to the Governor of Oklahoma a list of five 
(5) persons qualified to serve as members of the Oklahoma Veterans 
Commission.  All appointments shall be broadly representative of the 
veterans of this state in terms of age, gender, and race or 
ethnicity. The list shall be submitted to the Gove rnor not later 
than three (3) months prior to the expiration of the terms of office 
of the members of the Oklahoma Veterans Commission.  The Governor 
shall name one member from each of the following Veterans ’ groups:  
the American Legion; the Veterans of F oreign wars Wars; the Disabled 
American Veterans; the Paralyzed Veterans of America; the Military 
Order of the Purple Heart; and the National Guard Association of 
Oklahoma.  The members representing the American Legion and the 
Paralyzed Veterans of America shall take office no later than July 
1, 2015.  The members representing the Veterans of Foreign Wars and 
the Military Order of the Purple Heart shall take office no later 
than July 1, 2016.  The members representing the Disabled American 
Veterans and the Oklahoma National Guard Association of Oklahoma 
shall take office no later than July 1, 2017.  The Governor shall 
also appoint three members at large , one of whom may be a nonveteran 
and shall have a family member residing in a state veteran center, 
one to be appointed 2015, one to be appointed in 2016, and one to be 
appointed in 2017.   
 
SB86 HFLR 	Page 3 
BOLD FACE denotes Committee Amendments.  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
The executive officer of each veterans ’ organization operating 
within the State of Oklahoma this state shall, on or before January 
1 of the year in which the organization ’s appointee’s term expires, 
submit to the Secretary of State, the Governor, the President Pro 
Tempore of the Senate, and the Speaker of the House of 
Representatives a copy of the performance audit and the financial 
audit of the organization for the immediatel y preceding fiscal year 
of the organization.  Such audits shall be conducted in accordance 
with auditing standards generally accepted in the United States and 
shall clearly show the total paid membership of the organization and 
shall be certified to by a c ertified public accountant.  Failure to 
comply with this section shall render the organization ineligible to 
submit a nominee to the Governor.  The members of the Commission 
shall be appointed by the Governor with advice and consent of the 
Senate, and shall serve at the pleasure of the Governor.  When a 
vacancy on the Oklahoma Veterans Commission occurs, the organization 
which is represented by the vacant position shall submit a list of 
five (5) names to the Governor.  The Governor shall choose a 
replacement from that list.  No person shall be appointed by the 
Governor who is related by affinity or consanguinity within the 
third degree to any person employed by the Oklahoma Department of 
Veterans Affairs. 
Before any member appointed as provided herein shall enter upon 
his or her duties as a member of the Commission, he or she shall   
 
SB86 HFLR 	Page 4 
BOLD FACE denotes Committee Amendments.  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
take and subscribe to the oath of office as required by the 
Constitution of this state. 
Present members of the Commission shall continue in office until 
the expiration of their ter ms and until their successors are 
appointed and enter upon the duties of their offices.  Appointments 
shall be made for a three -year period.  Any vacancy on the 
Commission resulting from any cause shall be filled by appointment 
by the Governor for the rema inder of the term as provided in this 
section. 
No member of the Oklahoma Veterans Commission shall be employed 
by the Oklahoma Department of Veterans Affairs during the time of 
his or her service on the Oklahoma Veterans Commission nor shall any 
person who served as a member of the Oklahoma Veterans Commission be 
employed by the Oklahoma Department of Veterans Affairs subsequent 
to his or her service on the Commission for a period of two (2) 
years. 
SECTION 2.  This act shall become effective July 1, 2021. 
SECTION 3.  It being immediately necessary for the preservation 
of the public peace, health or safety, an emergency is hereby 
declared to exist, by reason whereof this act shall take effect and 
be in full force from and after its passage and approval. 
 
COMMITTEE REPORT BY: COMMITTEE ON VETERANS AND MILITARY AFFAIRS, 
dated 03/30/2021 - DO PASS.