Req. No. 1710 Page 1 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 STATE OF OKLAHOMA 1st Session of the 58th Legislature (2021) COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR SENATE BILL 86 By: Simpson COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE An Act relating to veterans; amending 72 O.S. 2011, Section 63.2, as last amended by Section 2, Chapter 262, O.S.L. 2014 (72 O.S. Supp. 2 020, Section 63.2), which relates to the Oklahoma Veterans Commission; modifying membership crite ria of Commission; providing an effective date; and declaring an emergency. BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA: SECTION 1. AMENDATORY 72 O.S. 2011, Section 63.2, as last amended by Section 2, Chapter 262, O.S.L. 2014 (72 O.S. Supp. 2020, Section 63.2), is amended to read as follow s: Section 63.2. The Oklahoma Veterans Commission shall consist of nine (9) members. At least eight (8) members all of whom shall be honorably discharged veterans ; provided, three one of the members shall be veterans a veteran of the Vietnam Conflict and one two shall be a veteran veterans of the Persian Gulf Wars. The members shall be selected in the following man ner: The state executive board or committees of the veterans ’ organizations named in this section shall each sub mit to the Governor of Oklahoma a list of five Req. No. 1710 Page 2 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 (5) persons qualified to serve as members of the Oklahoma Veterans Commission. All appointments shall be broadly representative of the veterans of this state in term s of age, gender, and race or ethnicity. The list shall be submitted to the Governor not later than three (3) months prior to the expiration of the terms of office of the members of the Oklahoma Veterans Commission. The Governor shall name one member from each of the following Veterans’ groups: the American Legion; the Veterans of Foreign wars Wars; the Disabled American Veterans; the Paralyzed Veterans of America; the Military Order of the Purple Heart; and th e National Guard Association of Oklahoma. The members representing the American Legion and the Paralyzed Veterans of America shall take offic e no later than July 1, 2015. The members representing the Veterans of Foreign Wars and the Military Order of the Purple Heart shall take office no later than July 1, 2016. The members representing the Disabled Ame rican Veterans and the Oklahoma National Guard Association of Oklahoma shall take office no later than July 1, 2017. The Governor shall also appoint three members at large, one of whom may be a nonvetera n and shall have a family member residing in a state veteran center, one to be appointed 201 5, one to be appointed in 2016, and one to be appointed in 2017. The executive officer of each veterans’ organization operating within the State of Oklahoma this state shall, on or before January 1 of the year in whi ch the organization’s appointee’s term expires, Req. No. 1710 Page 3 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 submit to the Secretary of State, the Governor, the President Pro Tempore of the Senate, and the Speaker o f the House of Representatives a copy of the perfo rmance audit and the financial audit of the organiza tion for the immediately preceding fisca l year of the organization. Such audits shall be conducted in accordance with auditing standards generally accept ed in the United States and shall clearly show the total paid membership of the organization and shall be certified to by a certified public a ccountant. Failure to comply with this section shall render the organization ine ligible to submit a nominee to th e Governor. The members of the Commission shall be appointed by the Governor with advice and consent of the Senate, and shall serve at the pl easure of the Governor. When a vacancy on the Oklahoma Veterans Commission occurs, the organization which is represented by the vacant position shall submit a list of five (5) names to the Governor. The Governor sh all choose a replacement from that list. No person shall be appointed by the Governor who is related by affinity or consanguinity within the third degree to any perso n employed by the Oklahoma Department of Veterans Affairs. Before any member appointed as provided herein shall enter upon his or her duties as a member of the Commission, h e or she shall take and subscribe to the oath of office as required by the Constitution of this state. Req. No. 1710 Page 4 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 Present members of the Commissio n shall continue in office until the expiration of their terms and until their s uccessors are appointed and enter upon th e duties of their offices. Appoi ntments shall be made for a three-year period. Any vacancy on the Commission resulting from any cause shall be filled by appointment by the Governor for the remainder of the term as provided in this section. No member of the Oklahoma Veterans Commission shall be employed by the Oklahoma Department of Ve terans Affairs during the time of his or her service on the Oklahoma Veterans Commission nor shall any person who served as a member of the Oklahoma Veterans Commission be employed by the Oklahoma Department of Veterans Affairs subsequent to his or her service on the Commission for a period of two (2) years. SECTION 2. This act shall become effective July 1, 2021. SECTION 3. It being immediately necessary for the pr eservation of the public peace, health or safety, an emergency is hereby declared to exist, by reason whereof this act shall take effect and be in full force from and after its passage and approval. 58-1-1710 MR 2/4/2021 12:39:09 PM