Senate
|
04/23/2021
|
Approved by Governor 04/23/2021
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2021
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2021
|
Enrolled, to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2021
|
Signed, returned to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2021
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 82 Nays: 13
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Provenzano
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2021
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2021
|
CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2021
|
Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2021
|
Referred to Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2021
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2021
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2021
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2021
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2021
|
Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative Bush (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2021
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2021
|
Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Senator Haste
|
|
|