Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB87 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 4, 2020

Engrossed

Bill March 2, 2021

Enrolled

Bill April 20, 2021

Amended

Bill April 8, 2021
Bill February 21, 2021