Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB880 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 01/21/2021

                             
 
 
Req. No. 1621 	Page 1  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
   1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
STATE OF OKLAHOMA 
 
1st Session of the 58th Legislature (2021) 
 
SENATE BILL 880 	By: Jett 
 
 
 
 
 
AS INTRODUCED 
 
An Act relating to torts; amending Section 1, Chapter 
160, O.S.L. 2020 (76 O.S. Supp. 20 20, Section 112), 
which relates to the COVID-19 Product Protection Act; 
removing definition; and providing an effective date . 
 
 
 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA: 
SECTION 1.     AMENDATORY     Section 1, Chapter 160, O.S.L. 
2020 (76 O.S. Supp. 2020, Section 11 2), is amended to read as 
follows: 
Section 112. A.  This section sha ll be known and may be cited 
as the “COVID-19 Product Protection Act ”. 
B.  As used in this a ct: 
1.  “COVID-19” means the novel coronavir us identified as SARS-
CoV-2, the disease caused by SARS-CoV-2, and conditions associated 
with the disease; 
2.  “COVID-19 public health emergency” means any emergency 
declared by the Governor of Oklahoma related to COVID-19, including 
but not limited to the emergency declared by the Governor by 
Executive Order 2020-07, and any amendments thereto, under the   
 
 
Req. No. 1621 	Page 2  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
   1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
Oklahoma Emergency Management Act of 2003, Section 683.1 et seq. of 
Title 63 of the Oklahoma Statutes, beginning on March 15, 2020, and 
the health emergency declared by the Governor by Executive Order 
2020-13, and any amendments thereto, under the Catastrophic Health 
Emergency Powers Act, Section 6101 et seq. of Title 63 of the 
Oklahoma Statutes, beginning on April 8, 2020; 
3.  “Disinfecting and cleaning su pplies” includes, but is not 
limited to, hand sanit izers, disinfectants, sprays , and wipes; 
4.  “Essential business” means a person or entity: 
a. within a critical infrastructure sector as defined by 
the United States Department of Homeland Security, 
b. defined as essential by the Oklahoma Department of 
Commerce through use of the North American Industry 
Classification System during the COVID-19 pandemic, or 
c. within an industry designated as critical or essential 
by Executive Order or Executive Memorandum ; 
5. “First responder” means state and local law e nforcement 
personnel, fire department personn el and emergency medical 
personnel.  First responder includes a person authorized by 
executive order who will be deployed in response to the COVID -19 
pandemic; 
6. 5.  “Health care facility” and “health care provider” shall 
have the same meaning as such terms are defined as provided in 
Section 6104 of Title 63 of the Oklahoma Statutes;   
 
 
Req. No. 1621 	Page 3  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
   1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
7. 6.  “Person” means an individual, firm, partnership, 
corporation or associat ion; 
8. 7.  “Personal protective equipment” means coveralls, face 
shields, gloves, gowns, masks, respirat ors, and other equipment 
designed to protect the wearer from the spread of infection or 
illness; and 
9. 8.  “Qualified product” means personal protecti ve equipment 
used to protect the wearer from COVID -19 or the spread of COVID -19; 
medical devices, equipment , or supplies used to treat COVID-19 
including products that are used or modified for an unapproved use 
to treat COVID-19 or prevent the spread of CO VID-19; medical 
devices, equipment, or supplies utilized outside of such product ’s 
normal use to treat COVID -19 or to prevent the spre ad of COVID-19; 
medications used to treat COVID -19 patients including medications 
prescribed or dispensed for off -label use to attempt to combat 
COVID-19; tests to diagnose or determine immunity to COVID -19; and 
components of qualified products. 
C.  Except as provided by subsection E of this section, any 
person that designs, manufactures, labels, sells, distributes , or 
donates disinfecting and cleaning supplies or personal pr otective 
equipment during and in response to the COVID -19 public health 
emergency that does not make such products in the ordinary course of 
business shall not be liable in a civil action alleging personal 
injury, death or property damage caused by or resu lting from the   
 
 
Req. No. 1621 	Page 4  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
   1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
product’s manufacturing or design, or a fa ilure to provide proper 
instructions or sufficient warnings. 
D. Except as provided by subsection E of this section, a 
government entity, health car e facility, health care pro vider, first 
responder, or any business, or the employer or agent of such 
business, that utilizes a product meeting the qualifications of 
either subsection C or D of this section, shall not be liable in a 
civil action alleging pe rsonal injury, death or pro perty damage 
caused by or resulting from the selection, distribution , or use of 
such product. 
E.  The immunity provided in subsections C and D of this section 
shall not apply to any person, or any employee or agent thereof, 
that: 
1. a. Had actual knowledge that the product was de fective 
when put to the use for which the product was 
manufactured, sold, distribut ed, or donated, and 
b. Acted with deliberate indifference to or conscious 
disregard of a substantial and unnecessary risk that 
the product would caus e serious injury to othe rs; or 
2.  Acted with a deliberate intention to cause har m. 
F.  Nothing contained i n this section shall be construed to: 
1.  Relieve a plaintiff of the need to satisfy any required 
element of a claim; or   
 
 
Req. No. 1621 	Page 5  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
   1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
2.  Amend, repeal, alter or affect any other immunit y or 
limitation of liability provided for under the laws of this state. 
G.  The provisions of this section shall apply to any claim 
arising on or after the emergency declared by the Governor of 
Oklahoma related to COVID-19 by Executive Order 2020-07 on March 15, 
2020. 
SECTION 2.  This act shall become effective November 1, 2021. 
 
58-1-1621 MR 1/21/2021 4:08:26 PM