Senate | 05/12/2021 | Approved by Governor 05/12/2021 | ||
Senate | 05/06/2021 | Sent to Governor | ||
House | 05/06/2021 | Signed, returned to Senate | ||
Senate | 05/06/2021 | Enrolled, to House | ||
Senate | 05/05/2021 | Referred for enrollment | ||
Senate | 05/05/2021 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 1 | ||
Senate | 05/05/2021 | HAs adopted | ||
Senate | 04/22/2021 | HAs read | ||
House | 04/22/2021 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
House | 04/21/2021 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 5 | ||
House | 04/21/2021 | Amended | ||
House | 04/21/2021 | House Rule suspended | ||
House | 04/21/2021 | General Order | ||
House | 04/21/2021 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 04/07/2021 | CR; Do Pass Insurance Committee | ||
House | 03/22/2021 | Second Reading referred to Insurance | ||
Senate | 03/11/2021 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/11/2021 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/10/2021 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 2 | ||
Senate | 03/10/2021 | Title restored | ||
Senate | 03/10/2021 | Emergency added | ||
Senate | 03/10/2021 | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute | ||
Senate | 02/23/2021 | Coauthored by Representative Sneed (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/22/2021 | Title stricken | ||
Senate | 02/22/2021 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/02/2021 | Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance | ||
Senate | 02/01/2021 | Authored by Senator Quinn |