Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB888 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 21, 2021

Engrossed

Bill May 2, 2022
Bill March 11, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 20, 2022
Bill April 9, 2021
Bill February 22, 2021

Amended

Bill April 9, 2021
Bill February 23, 2021