Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB89 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 4, 2020

Engrossed

Bill March 15, 2021

Enrolled

Bill April 26, 2021

Amended

Bill April 1, 2021
Bill March 4, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill March 3, 2021