Senate
|
05/28/2021
|
Approved by Governor 05/28/2021
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2021
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2021
|
Signed, returned to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2021
|
Enrolled, to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2021
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2021
|
To Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2021
|
Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 6
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator(s) Standridge
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2021
|
CCR adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2021
|
CCR submitted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2021
|
Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 42 Nays: 4
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2021
|
Enacting clause restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2021
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2021
|
CCR read
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2021
|
Conference granted, naming GCCA
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2021
|
SCs named Pugh, Rader, Rosino, Simpson, Kirt, Hicks
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2021
|
HAs rejected, conference requested
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative Fugate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2021
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2021
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2021
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 79 Nays: 6
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2021
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2021
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2021
|
Enacting clause stricken
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2021
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2021
|
CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2021
|
Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2021
|
Referred to Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2021
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2021
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 3
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2021
|
General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Bergstrom
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2021
|
Coauthored by Rosecrants
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative Fetgatter (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Jett
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2021
|
Reported Do Pass Finance committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Finance
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Senator Pugh
|
|
|