Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB893 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 21, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 22, 2021
Bill March 15, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 24, 2021

Amended

Bill April 15, 2021
Bill February 10, 2021