Senate
|
04/12/2021
|
Approved by Governor 04/12/2021
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2021
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2021
|
Enrolled, to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2021
|
Signed, returned to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2021
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2021
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 77 Nays: 10
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Stark, Lepak
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2021
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Stearman
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2021
|
CR; Do Pass Administrative Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Administrative Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2021
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Bergstrom
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2021
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2021
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 4
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2021
|
General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Hamilton
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2021
|
Coauthored by CrosswhiteHader
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2021
|
Coauthored by Gann
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2021
|
remove as principal author Representative Gann and substitute with Representative ODonnell
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2021
|
Remove as coauthor Senator Hamilton
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative Gann (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2021
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Bullard
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2021
|
Remove as coauthor Senator Boren
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Boren
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Senator Daniels
|
|
|