Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB913 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 21, 2021

Engrossed

Bill March 15, 2021

Enrolled

Bill April 7, 2021

Amended

Bill March 24, 2021
Bill February 25, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill February 24, 2021