House | 04/01/2021 | Title restored | ||
House | 04/01/2021 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Insurance Committee | ||
House | 03/22/2021 | Second Reading referred to Insurance | ||
Senate | 03/09/2021 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/09/2021 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/08/2021 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/08/2021 | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 2 | ||
Senate | 03/08/2021 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 02/18/2021 | Title stricken | ||
Senate | 02/18/2021 | Coauthored by Senator Stanley | ||
Senate | 02/18/2021 | Reported Do Pass as amended Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/11/2021 | Coauthored by Senator Jett | ||
Senate | 02/11/2021 | Coauthored by Senator Montgomery | ||
Senate | 02/02/2021 | Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance | ||
Senate | 02/01/2021 | Coauthored by Representative McEntire (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/01/2021 | Coauthored by Senator Rader | ||
Senate | 02/01/2021 | Authored by Senator McCortney |