Senate | 04/21/2021 | Approved by Governor 04/21/2021 | ||
Senate | 04/15/2021 | Sent to Governor | ||
Senate | 04/15/2021 | Enrolled, to House | ||
House | 04/15/2021 | Signed, returned to Senate | ||
Senate | 04/14/2021 | Referred for enrollment | ||
House | 04/14/2021 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 04/14/2021 | Coauthored by Representative(s) West (Kevin) | ||
House | 04/14/2021 | General Order | ||
House | 03/30/2021 | CR; Do Pass Children, Youth and Family Services Committee | ||
House | 03/22/2021 | Second Reading referred to Children, Youth and Family Services | ||
Senate | 03/02/2021 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/02/2021 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/01/2021 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/01/2021 | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 | ||
Senate | 03/01/2021 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 02/23/2021 | Coauthored by Representative McBride (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/22/2021 | Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/02/2021 | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services | ||
Senate | 02/01/2021 | Authored by Senator Hicks |