Senate
|
05/18/2021
|
Conferees unable to agree
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2021
|
Conference granted, naming GCCA
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2021
|
SCs named GCCA
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2021
|
HAs rejected, conference requested
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2021
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2021
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2021
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 84 Nays: 7
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2021
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2021
|
House Rule suspended
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2021
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2021
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2021
|
CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2021
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2021
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2021
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative Wallace (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2021
|
Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2021
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2021
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Hall
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2021
|
Remove as author Senator Hall; authored by Senator Leewright
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Senator Hall
|
|
|