Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB936 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 21, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 26, 2021
Bill March 10, 2021

Amended

Bill April 1, 2021
Bill March 9, 2021