House | 03/22/2021 | Second Reading referred to Rules | ||
Senate | 03/09/2021 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/09/2021 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/08/2021 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/08/2021 | Measure passed: Ayes: 35 Nays: 9 | ||
Senate | 03/08/2021 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 03/01/2021 | Coauthored by Representative Martinez (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/18/2021 | Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/10/2021 | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appr/Sub-Natural Resources and Regulatory Services sub-committee | ||
Senate | 02/02/2021 | Referred to Appr/Sub-Natural Resources and Regulatory Services | ||
Senate | 02/02/2021 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 02/01/2021 | Authored by Senator Taylor |